Elkelani, Saad Mehemed (CPSO#: 70291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 117
704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone: (519) 344-9031
Fax: (519) 344-9044
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Canada
Phone: (519) 464-4400
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
Phone: (519) 882-4325
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elkelani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Elkelani ( CPSO# 70291 )

Business Address:
117 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 1X4
Phone Number: (519) 344-9031

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4500

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
450 Blanche Street
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Phone Number: (519) 882-4325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAAD MEHEMED ELKELANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKELANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2004