Elliott, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 67778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: Blood, Elizabeth Anne (used until: 12 May 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Ext. 2292
Fax: (519) 837-6452
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elliott ( CPSO# 67778 )

Business Address:
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 822-5350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History