Ellis, David Albert Foster (CPSO#: 20915)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1967

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
500 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 6H7
Phone: (416) 229-1050
Fax: (416) 229-1260
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Ellis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ellis ( CPSO# 20915 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
500 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 6H7
Phone Number: (416) 229-1050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALBERT FOSTER ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1967

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As of September 27, 2017, Dr. Ellis has completed all the components of his SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)