Ellis, Peter Mills (CPSO#: 56122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street Victory 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6029
Fax: (613) 548-1346
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter M. Ellis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Ellis ( CPSO# 56122 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Victory 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
725 Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone Number: (613) 417-0854

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3100

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone Number: (613) 392-3749

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 04 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MILLS ELLIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993