Elmontaser, Ghazi Ibrahim A (CPSO#: 76711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Nov 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Priestman Street
Fredericton NB  E3B 5N5
Phone: (506) 452-5461
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Priestman street
Fredericton NB  E3B5N5
Canada
Phone: 5064525461
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 08 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GHAZI IBRAHIM A ELMONTASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMONTASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2016