Emelianova, Svetlana Vladislavovna (CPSO#: 73143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Second Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Ins, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
2nd Floor
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone: (416) 632-8701
Fax: (416) 632-8718
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Svetlana Vladislavovna Emelianova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Emelianova ( CPSO# 73143 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
2nd Floor
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 632-8701

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SVETLANA VLADISLAVOVNA EMELIANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMELIANOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Pharmacology & Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2006