Emerson, Kelly Jane (CPSO#: 65637)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre- Simcoe Muskoka Regional
Cancer Program
201 Georgian Dr.
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 43347
Fax: (705) 739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.J. Emerson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Emerson ( CPSO# 65637 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre - Simcoe Muskoka Regional
Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY JANE EMERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EMERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993