Engen, Dale Anundo (CPSO#: 73829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4914
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101


Corporation Name: James Engen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. James ( CPSO# 72135 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Room 2025 Etherington Hall
Division of Hematology
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2946

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesiology and
Perioperative Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 2 76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Providence Care Hospital Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DALE ANUNDO ENGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENGEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004