Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ennis, Jonathan David (CPSO#: 27416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ennis Medical
Professional Corporation
Suite 134
400 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X7
Phone: (416) 922-8370
Fax: (416) 922-1148
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health and Wellness Centre
University of Toronto
Koffler Student Services Centre
Main Floor, 214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 978-8070
Fax: (416) 978-7341
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ennis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ennis ( CPSO# 27416 )

Business Address:
134 - 400 Walmer Road
Toronto ON  M5P 2X7
Phone Number: (416) 922-8370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN DAVID ENNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENNIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975