Erdmann, Natalie Irene (CPSO#: 84568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Sochocky, Natalie Irene (used until: 31 May 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6580 Ext. 6304
Fax: 416-469-6805
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natalie Erdmann Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Erdmann ( CPSO# 84568 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATALIE IRENE ERDMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERDMANN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 26 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011