Erendzhinova, Ekaterina (CPSO#: 87720)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Omskij Ordena Trudovofo Krasnogo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Erendzhinova Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 220 1929 Russell Road Ottawa, ON K1G 4G3
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 24 Sep 2007 to 21 Oct 2007
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2007 to 16 Dec 2007
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 27 Jul 2009 to 21 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jun 2010 to 25 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014