Ernst, Donald Scott (CPSO#: 52954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Scott Ernst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2006


Corporation Name: Dr. D. Scott Ernst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ernst ( CPSO# 52954 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 06 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD SCOTT ERNST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERNST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1983 to 15 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2007