Escanlar, Peter Michael (CPSO#: 93664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Ave
Toronto ON  M3H 3V6
Phone: (416) 398-7355
Fax: (416) 398-7353
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Primacy Don Mills Medical Clinic
825 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Canada
Phone: (416) 383-1251
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Escanlar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Escanlar ( CPSO# 93664 )

Business Address:
Codsell Medical
1 Codsell Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 3V6
Phone Number: (416) 398-7355

Business Address:
825 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1V4
Phone Number: (416) 383-1251

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER MICHAEL ESCANLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESCANLAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012