Eskandar, Sherif Nagui Fayek (CPSO#: 77223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jan 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y-2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

13750 96 Ave
Surrey BC  V3V 1Z2
Canada
Phone: (604) 581-2211
County: 
Electoral District: 

2100 Bouvaird Dr. E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eskandar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Eskandar ( CPSO# 77223 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERIF NAGUI FAYEK ESKANDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESKANDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2003 to 06 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jan 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004