Esmail, Sherali (CPSO#: 50512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite GPH 1
18 Valley Woods Road
Toronto ON  M3A 0A1
Phone: 416 726 8489
Fax: (416) 224-2304
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.G. Esmail Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Esmail ( CPSO# 50512 )

Business Address:
GPH 1
18 Valley Woods Road
Toronto ON  M3A 0A1
Phone Number: (416) 726-8489

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHERALI ESMAIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ESMAIL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1984