Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Etchells, Edward Evan (CPSO#: 58253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room H469
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5996
Fax: (416) 480-6777
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Etchells Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Etchells ( CPSO# 58253 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room H469
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD EVAN ETCHELLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ETCHELLS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988