Evans, Stephen Douglas (CPSO#: 63584)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main Street Medical Clinic
1251 Main Street
Stittsville ON  K2S 2E5
Phone: (613) 831-7372
Fax: (613) 831-6381
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3161 Strandherd Drive unit 305
Nepean ON  J2J 5N1
Canada
Phone: (613) 823-7766
Fax: (613) 823-0063
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Evans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Evans ( CPSO# 63584 )

Business Address:
Main Street Medical Clinic
1251 Main Street
Stittsville ON  K2S 2E5
Phone Number: (613) 831-7372

Business Address:
190 Richmond Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 6W6
Phone Number: (613) 719-7837

Business Address:
Suite 305
3161 Strandherd Drive
Ottawa ON  K2J 5N1
Phone Number: (613) 823-7766

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN DOUGLAS EVANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EVANS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2008