Ewing, Kevin Lindsay (CPSO#: 76439)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital,
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4444
Fax: (519) 973-0803
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Ewing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ewing ( CPSO# 76439 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN LINDSAY EWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EWING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2006