Exley, Graham Douglas (CPSO#: 87119)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William FHO
1260 Golf Links Rd Suite 201
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1223
Fax: (807) 623-5155
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graham Exley Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Exley ( CPSO# 87119 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1223

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAHAM DOUGLAS EXLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EXLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009