Faber, Kenneth John (CPSO#: 62596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6312
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth J. Faber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Faber ( CPSO# 62596 )

Business Address:
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6312

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH JOHN FABER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FABER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1991