Fahim, Raouf Michel (CPSO#: 80606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Group
2116 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 6M7
Phone: 613 4226047
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Fahim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fahim ( CPSO# 80606 )

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Group
2116 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1J 6M7
Phone Number: (613) 422-6047

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2004 to 03 May 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 May 2005 to 03 May 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]


            As from July 28, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Raouf Michel Fahim,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Fahim to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")
                                                  of
                                        DR. RAOUF MICHEL FAHIM
                                             ("Dr. Fahim")
                                                  to
                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Fahim, certificate of registration number 80606, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 100364 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct in my family practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that, in addition to the present Undertaking,
                  the College will also deliver a caution in person.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Fahim, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it.  

            (6)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake that, effective immediately, I shall post a
                        sign in the waiting room(s) and in any examination room of all my
                        Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Appendix "A".  For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing
                        in Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr.
                        Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP.  Further information may be found on
                        the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in any
                        language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (6)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).
                  
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in Ontario
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Fahim, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Fahim, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Fahim shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms
                        and the examination rooms of all his Practice Locations, which
                        states as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing in
                        Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr.
                        Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on
                        the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                        www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Fahim, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and to
                  provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that
                  led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.




Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 23, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: Member
Active Date: July 28, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Raouf Michel Fahim to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 28, 2016:

Dr. Fahim shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and the examination rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Fahim is a Family Physician practicing in Ophthalmology and was qualified in Ophthalmology in the UK. Dr. Fahim MD, MS, FRCS(UK), CCFP. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".