Fakhry, Yousef Mohammad Saeed (CPSO#: 76574)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yousef Fakhry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 04 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 28 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2015