Falvo, Lisa Michelle (CPSO#: 86496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lower Level
435 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3C 5K6
Phone: (705) 222-7244
Fax: (705) 222-7246
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury Outpatient Centre
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-6601
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA MICHELLE FALVO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FALVO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011