Fan, Lily Zhuoqi (CPSO#: 96290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catherines General Hospital
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Fan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fan ( CPSO# 96290 )

Business Address:
St Catherines General Hospital
Dept of Diagnostic Imaging
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 31 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LILY ZHUOQI FAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012