Fanous, Victor Guirguis Nashed (CPSO#: 90335)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 24 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

558 Belmont Ave West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 08 Apr 2009 to 22 Jun 2009
PEAP - Resident - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 23 Jun 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2013