Farb, Richard Ian (CPSO#: 55462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
McLaughlin 3-404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2636
Fax: (416) 603-4257
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Farb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 3MC404
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5981


Corporation Name: L.M. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. White ( CPSO# 60766 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. M. Beresford ( CPSO# 76273 )
Dr. A. Hanbidge ( CPSO# 63102 )
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )

Business Address:
Suite 562
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD IAN FARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1986