Farewell, John Clarence (CPSO#: 50520)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
University Centre
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone: (416) 597-3422
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Center for Addiction and Mental
Health
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 7350
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

378 Glengrove Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1W5
Canada
Phone: (416) 487-3116
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Northumberland Health Care
Corporation
Community Health Program
975 Elgin Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J3
Canada
Phone: (905) 377-9891
Fax: (905) 377-9895
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John C. Farewell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rettl ( CPSO# 53926 )
Dr. J. Farewell ( CPSO# 50520 )

Business Address:
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 8M1
Phone Number: (705) 876-5028

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-2015

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3442

Business Address:
378 Glengrove Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1W5
Phone Number: (416) 919-3804

Business Address:
1011 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone Number: (905) 377-9891

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CLARENCE FAREWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAREWELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1984