Farnell, David Anthony (CPSO#: 100296)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 525-9140
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joan Li Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Farnell ( CPSO# 100296)
Dr. J. Li ( CPSO# 100389)

Business Address:
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 563-1212

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Family Medicine
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY FARNELL shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. FARNELL is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. FARNELL shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. FARNELL is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. FARNELL shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. FARNELL is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. FARNELL no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018