Farooqi, Muna Iqbal (CPSO#: 84819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Downey Road
Guelph ON  N1C 1A2
Phone: (519)827-9779
Fax: (519)827-0162
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. I. Farooqi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farooqi ( CPSO# 84819 )

Business Address:
115 Downey Road
Guelph ON  N1C 1A2
Phone Number: (519) 827-9779

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Qatar

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUNA IQBAL FAROOQI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAROOQI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008