Farrell, Ashleigh Dawn (CPSO#: 93940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 822-6411
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ashleigh Farrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Farrell ( CPSO# 93940 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 27 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHLEIGH DAWN FARRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRELL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015