Farrell, Christopher John (CPSO#: 50528)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 728-2077
Fax: (613) 728-3816
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite. 208
2948 baseline
Ottawa
K2H8T5
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Canada
Phone: (613) 2882059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Unit 116
150 Katimavik
Kanata ontario
Ottawa ON  K2L 2N2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Farrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Farrell ( CPSO# 50528 )

Business Address:
703 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 728-2077

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JOHN FARRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARRELL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1984