Farrell, Sandra Anne (CPSO#: 50531)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Farrell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Credit Valley Hospital Trillium Health Partners 2200 Eglinton Avenue West Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Date Received: 22 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Genetics Effective: 21 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016