Faughnan, Marie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70648)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Suite 6044
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5412
Fax: (416) 864-5922
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHUM Hotel Dieu
3840 St Urbain
Montreal QC  H3W 1T8
Canada
Phone: (514) 890-8000
Fax: (514) 412-7123
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 17 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE ELIZABETH FAUGHNAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAUGHNAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1997