Faulkner, Paul Edward (CPSO#: 63645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7199 Gelert Road
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Canada
Phone: 705 457 1392
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Faulkner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Faulkner ( CPSO# 63645 )

Business Address:
7199 Gelert Road
PO Box 115
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 457-1392

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 336-4116

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD FAULKNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAULKNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1992