Fayet, Cristina (CPSO#: 88798)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkdale Community Health Centre
1229 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6K 1L2
Phone: (416) 537-2455
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Four Villages Community Health Ctre
3446 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 2S1
Canada
Phone: (416) 604-3362
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRISTINA FAYET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010