Fayez, Ibrahim Halim Ibrahim (CPSO#: 78492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton East Medical Centre
4525 Ebenezer Road. Suite 1
Brampton ON  L6P 2K8
Phone: (905) 794-2003
Fax: (905) 794-2054
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

A2B-5995 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L3S 0A2
Canada
Phone: (289) 859-9901
Fax: (905) 201-6565
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Grand Genesis Health
Richmond Hill Medical and Surgical
9080 Yonge street. L2, Unit 12
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Baycrest
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Fax: (647) 788-1199
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2640 Rutherford Rd #100
Vaughan ON  L4K 0H3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

York Medical
10660 Yonge street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Canada
Phone: 905-770-9096
Fax: 905-770-4703
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Fayez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fayez ( CPSO# 78492 )

Business Address:
York Medical Centre
Suite 2 & 3
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Egypt
Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jul 2006 CFPC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM HALIM IBRAHIM FAYEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006