Feibel, Robert John (CPSO#: 55638)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Suite 1652, Critical Care Wing
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8849
Fax: (613) 737-8837
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Feibel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Feibel ( CPSO# 55638 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Critical Care Wing Suite 1652
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8849

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN FEIBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEIBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1990