Feinstein, Anthony (CPSO#: 66979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG 16
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4097
Fax: (416) 480-4613
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Feinstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Feinstein ( CPSO# 66979 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Psychiatry
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room FG16
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4216

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY FEINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEINSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Jan 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1997