Feldman, Sandra Helene (CPSO#: 55574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: Wong, Sandra Helene (used until: 28 Feb 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
suite 901-
505 consumers road
Toronto ON  M2J 4V8
Phone: (416) 631-3000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandra Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feldman ( CPSO# 55574 )

Business Address:
901 - 505 Consumers Road
Toronto ON  M2J 4V8
Phone Number: (416) 631-0298

Business Address:
114 Cranbrooke Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1M5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA HELENE FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1986