Feldstein, Noah Aaron (CPSO#: 71607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
580 Algoma St
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V5
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Feldstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Feldstein ( CPSO# 71607 )

Business Address:
Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
580 Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 343-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jul 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOAH AARON FELDSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999