Fenton, John Andrew (CPSO#: 59804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oaks Plaza
Unit 3 4 5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S8
Phone: (705) 522-4611
Fax: (705) 522-4158
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Fenton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Fenton ( CPSO# 59804 )

Business Address:
Oaks Plaza
Unit 3-4-5
2140 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5S8
Phone Number: (705) 522-4611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 01 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ANDREW FENTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FENTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1989