Ferencz, Joseph Carl (CPSO#: 60695)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
P O Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 39410
Fax: (905) 381-5605
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Ferencz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ferencz ( CPSO# 60695 )

Business Address:
St. Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
Mountain Health Services
100 West 5th Street
P.O. Box 585
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH CARL FERENCZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERENCZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1990