Ferguson, Kathleen Anne (CPSO#: 57142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathleen Ferguson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 3 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANNE FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Disease

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1987