Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Fernando, Mary Lilamani (CPSO#: 59398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404A
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 247-8880
Fax: (613) 680-5170
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fernando and Lynn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Lynn ( CPSO# 59384 )
Dr. M. Fernando ( CPSO# 59398 )

Business Address:
404A - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 247-8880

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LILAMANI FERNANDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERNANDO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1989