Ferri, Melanie (CPSO#: 74679)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 43897
Fax: (905) 575-2660
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ferri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ferri ( CPSO# 74679 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
CVDC Suite 103
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-2066

Business Address:
Southwest Imaging
35 Upper Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3W2
Phone Number: (905) 387-4551

Business Address:
Welland County General Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 732-6111

Business Address:
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T8
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE FERRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005