Fettes, Lisa Fern (CPSO#: 54035)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: Leitch, Lisa Fern (used until: 21 Oct 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Fettes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fettes ( CPSO# 54035 )

Business Address:
North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA FERN FETTES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FETTES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985