Field, Sharon Dorothy (CPSO#: 58604)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terry McAllister Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Field ( CPSO# 58604 )
Dr. T. McAllister ( CPSO# 58287 )

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-2386

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2015