Filakovic, Zdenko (CPSO#: 73684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Zagreb, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6010
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filakovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Filakovic ( CPSO# 73684 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6001


Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZDENKO FILAKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILAKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004