Filippone, Daniela Giuseppina Serafina (CPSO#: 67903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
845 Regent Street South
Suite 105
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Phone: (705) 674-7481
Fax: (705) 674-7113
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniela Filippone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Filippone ( CPSO# 67903 )

Business Address:
105 - 845 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Phone Number: (705) 674-7481

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELA GIUSEPPINA SERAFINA FILIPPONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILIPPONE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1999