Filosa, Thomas Michael (CPSO#: 71384)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Family Physicians
101-377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 471-9999
Fax: (905) 471-3627
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Filosa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Filosa ( CPSO# 71384 )

Business Address:
Markham Family Physicians
Suite 101
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 471-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS MICHAEL FILOSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FILOSA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1999